This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 21:01:59 (UTC).

EMILIA JANEKE VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 EMILIA JANEKE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1100

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANEKE EMILIA

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINER PAUL

Defendant Attorney

SCHWETTMANN ERIC CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/29/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

7/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/07/2022

9/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/07/2022

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY STATE COURT ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

9/7/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY STATE COURT ACTION AND SUBMIT TO BINDING ARBITRATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • Hearing09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Stay State Court Action and Submit to Binding Arbitration; [Proposed] Order); Filed by Emilia Janeke (Plaintiff); Southern California Healthcare System, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/07/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Emilia Janeke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Emilia Janeke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Emilia Janeke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Emilia Janeke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Emilia Janeke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERIC C. SCHWETTMANN