This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2022 at 04:58:25 (UTC).

EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL. VS DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, A DEPARTMENT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, A DEPARTMENT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1747

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION DBA EMANATE HEALTH QUEEN OF THE VALLEY HOSPITAL

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES A DEPARTMENT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOVICH RICHARD ALAN

Defendant Attorney

EDELSTEIN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition for Writ of Mandate

5/28/2021: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

6/1/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

6/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON WRIT AND PROPOSED ORDER

8/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON WRIT AND PROPOSED ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 85 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Vacate Trial Setting Conference and Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Writ and Proposed Order); Filed by Department of Health Care Services, a Department of the State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Department of Health Care Services, a Department of the State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Emanate Health Medical Center, a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon); Filed by Emanate Health Medical Center, a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Emanate Health Medical Center, a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Emanate Health Medical Center, a California nonprofit corporation (Petitioner); Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases where EMANATE HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDELSTEIN ANDREW