This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 03:17:34 (UTC).

ELVIS BRUCE ROBLES VS DELIVERY SURFERS D/B/A DELIVERY SURFERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 ELVIS BRUCE ROBLES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DELIVERY SURFERS D/B/A DELIVERY SURFERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4093

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBLES ELVIS BRUCE

Defendant

DELIVERY SURFERS DBA DELIVERY SURFERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

CHAN KA IN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

2/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KELLY KA IN CHAN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

1/14/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KELLY KA IN CHAN RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

8/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Notice of Settlement

8/3/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/3/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/3/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/22/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2020

6/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/05/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/28/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal); Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Kelly Ka In Chan Re: Order to Show Cause); Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal); Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order re Case Management Conference); Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elvis Bruce Robles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAN KA IN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NALBANDYAN A. JACOB