This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2022 at 14:49:35 (UTC).

ELVA TORRES VS VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 ELVA TORRES filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7539

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES ELVA

Defendant

VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANAH SETAREH

Defendant Attorney

STONE GENE S

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/24/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/24/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/24/2022: Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/29/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/29/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2024
  • Hearing08/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2024
  • Hearing02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Elva Torres (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elva Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/15/2022; Service Cost: 148.92; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elva Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elva Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elva Torres (Plaintiff); As to: Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE GENE S. ESQ.