This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 13:58:01 (UTC).

ELVA LOPEZ NAVARRO, ET AL. VS DELTA AIRLINES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On April 7, 2022, Elva Lopez Navarro, Jose Lopez, Lidia Angelica Lopez and Elvia Lopez (hereinafter “Plaintiffs”), represented by Azizzadeh Shawn, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Los Angeles World Airports (hereinafter “Defendant” or “LAX”) and Does 1 to 50 (collectively “Defendants”), seeking an award of general and special damages along with costs and other reliefs for the Defendants’ alleged negligence. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court in the Spring Street Courthouse with Judge .

In their complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “On or about July 13, 2021, Plaintiffs were scheduled to board flight 840 with Delta Airlines, departing from Los Angeles, California at 8:08 a.m., arriving in Oahu, Honolulu, Hawaii at 10:55 a.m. Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel was wheelchair bound and personnel from Defendant, Delta Airlines, Inc. instructed Mr. Rangel that he would need to board through a separate entrance than the rest of the passengers. Plaintiff, Elvia Lopez, asked if her mother, Elva Lopez could assist Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel through the separate entrance and onto the plane. Delta Airlines, Inc. personnel instructed Plaintiffs that they could not accompany Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel and that Delta Airlines, Inc. employees would be assisting Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel onto the aircraft without the family present.”

The Plaintiffs further alleged that, “Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel was taken through a separate entrance by Delta Airlines, Inc. personnel to board the plane. Delta Airlines, Inc. personnel placed Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel on a steep ramp to enter the aircraft. While on the ramp, Mr. Rangel’s wheelchair fell backwards and off the ramp causing Mr. Rangel to fall to the ground and sustain severe injury including, but not limited to (1) head laceration; (2) occipital hematoma; (3) occipital skull fracture; and (4) confused speech. His medical records note that “patient’s mental status deteriorated within first 2 hours in ED.”

The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “Plaintiffs are informed and believe, and thereon allege, that at all times mentioned herein, DELTA, including DOES 1 through 50, inclusive, owed a duty of care to all reasonably foreseeable people, invitees and guests, including Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel, and Plaintiffs, to reasonably, and safely, assist Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel onto the aircraft. Plaintiffs are informed and believe, and thereon allege, that Defendants, and each of them, improperly installed the steel ramp, described above, at an unreasonably high incline and in a manner that had a propensity to cause wheelchairs to fall backwards.”

The Plaintiffs then alleged that, “As a legal, direct and proximate result of the reckless and negligent conduct of Defendants, and each of them, Plaintiffs have sustained damages resulting from the loss of love, affection, society, service, comfort, support, right of support, expectations of future support and counseling, companionship, solace and mental support, as well as other benefits and assistance of Decedent Ricardo Lopez Rangel.”

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs is for alleged negligence – wrongful death.

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested the Court for a judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs on all causes of action, an award of general and special damages in a sum according to proof on all causes of action and for all fees and costs, including attorney’s fees, along with any further relief that the Court considers just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1846

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ ELVIA

LOPEZ JOSE

LOPEZ LIDIA ANGELICA

NAVARRO ELVA LOPEZ

Defendants

DELTA AIRLINES INC.

LAX WORLD AIRPORT

ABM AVIATION INC.

ERMC AVIATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZZADEH SHAWN

Defendant Attorney

AUBERT GARTH W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/24/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/13/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/13/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/7/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/7/2022: Complaint

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ABM AVIATION, INC. AND DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;

6/20/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ABM AVIATION, INC. AND DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/19/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/18/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

5/17/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

5/15/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND)

5/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

4/14/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

18 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2025
  • Hearing04/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2024
  • Hearing03/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2024
  • Hearing03/06/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Delta Airlines, Inc. (Defendant); ABM AVIATION, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike DEFENDANTS ABM AVIATION, INC. AND DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;: Name Extension: DEFENDANTS ABM AVIATION, INC. AND DELTA AIR LINES, INC.S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/02/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from ERMC AVIATION, LLC (DOE 1) (Defendant) to ERMC AVIATION, LLC (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: As To Parties changed from ERMC AVIATION, LLC (DOE 1) (Defendant) to ERMC AVIATION, LLC (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elva Lopez Navarro (Plaintiff); Jose Lopez (Plaintiff); Lidia Angelica Lopez (Plaintiff); Elvia Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Delta Airlines, Inc. (Defendant); LAX World Airport (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elva Lopez Navarro (Plaintiff); Jose Lopez (Plaintiff); Lidia Angelica Lopez (Plaintiff); Elvia Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Delta Airlines, Inc. (Defendant); LAX World Airport (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1846 Hearing Date: May 10, 2023 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

Plaintiffs’ motion for leave to amend the complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are ordered to file the first amended complaint attached as Exhibit B to their motion within 10 days of this order.

Legal Standard

California Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (a)(1) provides, in relevant part: “The court may, in furtherance of justice, and on any terms as may be proper, allow a party to amend any pleading or proceeding by adding or striking out the name of any party, or by correcting a mistake in the name of a party, or a mistake in any other respect; and may, upon like terms, enlarge the time for answer or demurrer. The court may likewise, in its discretion, after notice to the adverse party, allow, upon any terms as may be just, an amendment to any pleading or proceeding in other particulars; and may upon like terms allow an answer to be made after the time limited by this code.”

“This discretion should be exercised liberally in favor of amendments, for judicial policy favors resolution of all disputed matters in the same lawsuit.” (Kittredge Sports Co. v. Superior Court (1989) 213 Cal.App.3d 1045, 1047.) Ordinarily, the court will not consider the validity of the proposed amended pleading in ruling on a motion for leave since grounds for a demurrer or motion to strike are premature. The court, however, does have discretion to deny leave to amend where a proposed amendment fails to state a valid cause of action as a matter of law and the defect cannot be cured by further amendment. (See California Casualty General Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (1985) 173 Cal.App.3d 274, 281 (overruled on other grounds by Kransco v. American Empire Surplus Lines Ins. Co. (2000) 23 Cal.4th 390).)

Under California Rules of Court Rule 3.1324(a), a motion to amend a pleading shall (1) include a copy of the proposed amendment or amended pleading, which must be serially numbered to differentiate it from previous pleadings or amendments; (2) state what allegations in the previous pleading are proposed to be deleted, if any, and where, by page, paragraph and line number, the deleted allegations are located; and (3) state what allegations are proposed to be added to the previous pleading, if any, and where, by page, paragraph, and line number, the additional allegations are located.

Under California Rule of Court Rule 3.1324(b), a separate declaration must accompany the motion and must specify (1) the effect of the amendment; (2) why the amendment is necessary and proper; (3) when the facts giving rise to the amended allegations were discovered; and (4) the reasons why the request for amendment was not made earlier.

Discussion

Plaintiffs seek leave to file a first amended complaint (FAC), to add new allegations regarding Doe defendants, ERMC Aviation LLC and ABM Aviation, Inc., and to add new information about Decedent falling off the ramp of the bus and not the airplane. Additionally, new allegations are made against all defendants, and not just Delta, for improperly supervising Decedent and carelessly instructing him to board the bus using the ramp without any assistance. Through discovery, Plaintiffs learned on February 6, 2023, that various employees of ABM and ERMC were involved with the boarding process. It is believed that ABM and ERMC were employed by Delta. The FAC removes LAX World Airports (a public entity) from the first cause of action and adds ERMC and ABM. Further, the original complaint alleged common law negligence against defendant LAX, a public entity. The FAC adds a second cause of action to allege statutory violations under Government code section 835 and 815.2. The FAC also contains a new cause of action for negligent hiring, retention, and supervision against Defendant Delta.

The Court finds Plaintiff has complied with CRC Rule 3.1324 by including a copy of the proposed amended complaint and indicating what allegations are proposed to be added to the previous pleading, and what allegations are proposed to be deleted. Plaintiffs also explain that they recently learned of Defendants ERMC and ABM’s involvement in this matter. Further, Plaintiffs explained that through meet and confer efforts, they agreed to allege Government code section 835 and 815.2 claims instead of common law claims against a public entity. This is sufficient to explain why the amendment is necessary and proper, when the facts giving rise to the amended allegations were discovered, and why it was not made earlier.

As Defendants have not opposed the motion for leave to amend, it does not appear any party would be prejudiced by permitting this amendment. Further, trial is set for March 20, 2024; thus, there is sufficient time to conduct discovery and prepare for trial.

Accordingly, the Court grants the motion for leave to amend the complaint.

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiffs’ motion for leave to amend the complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are ordered to file the first amended complaint attached as Exhibit B to their motion within 10 days of this order.

Moving party is directed to give notice.