Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 02:52:43 (UTC).

ELSY RAMIREZ VS MELROSE GARDENS LA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 ELSY RAMIREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MELROSE GARDENS LA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5842

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ ELSY

Defendants

MELROSE GARDENS LA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

ROMERO DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAZANDJIAN HAIG B

Defendant Attorney

DE CASTRO JOSE-MANUEL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/7/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Hearing06/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Melrose Gardens LA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Melrose Gardens LA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elsy Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE CASTRO JOSE-MANUEL