This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 11:40:07 (UTC).

ELSA GONZALEZ-RIVAS, ET AL. VS MATCHMASTER DYING AND FINISHING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 ELSA GONZALEZ-RIVAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MATCHMASTER DYING AND FINISHING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9386

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ-RIVAS ELSA

Defendants

MATCHMASTER DYING AND FINISHING

MATCHMASTER DYING AND FINISHING DBA ANTEX KNITTING MILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRESEN SOLOMON ERIC

Defendant Attorney

KELLY JOEL P.

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SOLOMON E. GRSEN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/18/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SOLOMON E. GRSEN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL

3/2/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DISMISSAL)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DISMISSAL)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

12/11/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Appearance

9/23/2020: Notice of Appearance

Status Conference Statement - DEFENDANT'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

9/23/2020: Status Conference Statement - DEFENDANT'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

9/24/2020: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

9/10/2020: Status Conference Statement - PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE CLASS ACTION STATEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;) OF 09/17/2020

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;) OF 09/17/2020

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

7/22/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

7/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION AND INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (COMPLEX LITIGATION PROGRAM)

Initial Status Conference Order

6/24/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 06/24/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;) OF 06/24/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

6/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION;)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:48 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketOrder (Granting Dismissal); Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Solomon E. Grsen in Support of Request for Dismissal); Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketStipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference; Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff); Matchmaster Dying and Finishing (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered); Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;) of 06/24/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elsa Gonzalez-Rivas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATCHMASTER DYEING & FINISHING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLY JOEL PAUL