This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2023 at 08:42:58 (UTC).

ELSA ATIENZO, ET AL. VS CTI FOODS HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 ELSA ATIENZO, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CTI FOODS HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5839

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ATIENZO ALICIA

ATIENZO ELSA

ATIENZO HECTOR

ATIENZO RYAN

Defendants

CTI FOODS AZUSA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CTI FOODS HOLDING COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDMAN JEFFREY A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ASHLEY

8/11/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ASHLEY

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/10/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

8/10/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

10/13/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Elsa Atienzo, et al. on 08/10/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Elsa Atienzo, Ryan Atienzo, Alicia Atienzo, Hector Atienzo, and Ashley Atienzo as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ryan Atienzo (Plaintiff); Alicia Atienzo (Plaintiff); Hector Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ashley Atienzo (Plaintiff); As to: CTI Foods Holding Company, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); CTI Foods Azusa, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff); As to: CTI Foods Holding Company, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 51.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff); As to: CTI Foods Azusa, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 08/23/2022; Service Cost: 93.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ryan Atienzo (Plaintiff); Alicia Atienzo (Plaintiff); Hector Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ashley Atienzo (Plaintiff); As to: CTI Foods Holding Company, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); CTI Foods Azusa, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Ashley; Signed and Filed by: Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ryan Atienzo (Plaintiff); Alicia Atienzo (Plaintiff); Hector Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ashley Atienzo (Plaintiff); As to: Ashley Atienzo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Ashley: Filed By: Hector Atienzo (Plaintiff),Alicia Atienzo (Plaintiff),Ryan Atienzo (Plaintiff),Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff),Ashley Atienzo (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Ashley: Status Date changed from 08/11/2022 to 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ryan Atienzo (Plaintiff); Alicia Atienzo (Plaintiff); Hector Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ashley Atienzo (Plaintiff); As to: CTI Foods Holding Company, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); CTI Foods Azusa, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elsa Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ryan Atienzo (Plaintiff); Alicia Atienzo (Plaintiff); Hector Atienzo (Plaintiff); Ashley Atienzo (Plaintiff); As to: CTI Foods Holding Company, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); CTI Foods Azusa, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less