This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2019 at 00:28:45 (UTC).

ELMARIE HARVEY VS LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 ELMARIE HARVEY filed an Other lawsuit against LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9969

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

HARVEY ELMARIE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 200

LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER LLC

CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER

Guardian Ad Litem

SMITH ROQUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE GEBLER FIRM PC

GEBLER GARY LEE

Defendant Attorneys

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.

WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.

GONZALEZ MICHAEL DALE

Minor Attorney

GEBLER GARY L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE:)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE:)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - Minute Order (APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, FOR DE...)

2/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, FOR DE...)

Order - Ruling

2/19/2019: Order - Ruling

Order - Order Proposed Order Re: Application for Good Faith Filed on Behalf of Defendant Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

2/20/2019: Order - Order Proposed Order Re: Application for Good Faith Filed on Behalf of Defendant Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

1/4/2019: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION O...)

1/31/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION O...)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -

1/12/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -

Notice - Notice OF ENTRY OF ORDER/RULING

10/17/2018: Notice - Notice OF ENTRY OF ORDER/RULING

NOTICE OF RULING

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/27/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DECLARATION OF GLENNA M. FRANCIS IN OPPOSITION TO THE PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

7/3/2018: DECLARATION OF GLENNA M. FRANCIS IN OPPOSITION TO THE PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANTS, LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC DBA LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER

7/3/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANTS, LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC DBA LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

7/17/2018: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

NOTICE OF RULING

7/31/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/26/2018: DEFENDANT CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT CEDKRS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

4/26/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT CEDKRS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • Hearing01/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE:)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketOrder (Proposed Order Re: Application for Good Faith Filed on Behalf of Defendant Cedars-Sinai Medical Center); Filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Hearing - Other (Application for Determination on Good Faith Settlement) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER, FOR DE...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketApplication-Miscellaneous (FOR ELMARIE HARVEY GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (ON GLENNA M.FRANCIS ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (Glenna M. Francis; ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (Plaintiff ElMarie Harvey's Civil Case Cover Sheet ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint (for Plaintiff ElMarie Harvey ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elmarie Harvey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elmarie Harvey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA BREA REHABILITAION CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALKER KATHLEEN M. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.