This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 03:17:28 (UTC).

ELLIS CHOI ET AL VS BHAJNEET SINGH MALIK ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 ELLIS CHOI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BHAJNEET SINGH MALIK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DENNIS J. LANDIN and RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6299

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DENNIS J. LANDIN

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

CHOI CHARTER

CHOI ELLIS

CHUN GEE SUN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

MALIK NATASHA

MALIK BHAJNEET SINGH

KAUR NATASHA

MALIK NATASHA KAUR

Minors

CHOI CLAYTON

CHOI CARTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

WALLIN & RUSSELL LLP

WALLIN MICHAEL ADAM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

LAW OFFICES OF EDWARD C. IP & ASSOC. APC

VO MICHELLE NGOC

REINHOLTZ JACK RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

7/3/2017: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/25/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

9/15/2017: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

11/1/2017: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

11/15/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/1/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Hearing

1/30/2019: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Hearing

Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Hearing

1/30/2019: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Hearing

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/21/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

5/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/26/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Unknown

7/3/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/25/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

CHECK ALERT

8/24/2017: CHECK ALERT

REDEMPTION/REMITTANCE NOTICE

8/30/2017: REDEMPTION/REMITTANCE NOTICE

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal Pursuant to Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Request for Dismissal]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by ELLIS CHOI (Plaintiff); GEE SUN CHUN (Plaintiff); CARTER CHOI (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; (Trial) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department D; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Mandatory Settlement Conference) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal in Light of Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Order (APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION A MINOR, CLAYTON CHOI); Filed by Charter Choi (Plaintiff); CLAYTON CHOI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Order (APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION); Filed by CARTER CHOI (Plaintiff); Charter Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal in Light of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM C1VIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR CLAYTON CHOI GUARDIAN AD LITEM(FAXED) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR CARTER CHOI GUARDIAN AD LITEM(COPY) ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ELLIS CHOI (Plaintiff); GEE SUN CHUN (Plaintiff); Charter Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less