This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 15:09:12 (UTC).

ELLEN PARDAU, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON CO., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 ELLEN PARDAU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON CO . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES and WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7039

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARDAU ELLEN

SCHMIDT BRANDI

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON CO.

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOX DAVID ADAM

SIEGLOCK CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/5/2021: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 05/14/2021

5/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 05/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

5/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

5/26/2021: Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE ST...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

6/29/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-EIGHTH PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on January 18, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021.) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the clai...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Co. (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on September 1, 2021.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why the st...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Add-on to JCCP Petition; Filed by Southern California Edison Co. (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Add-on to JCCP Petition; Filed by Southern California Edison Co. (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 11:59 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 05/14/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ellen Pardau (Plaintiff); Brandi Schmidt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ellen Pardau (Plaintiff); Brandi Schmidt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ellen Pardau (Plaintiff); Brandi Schmidt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant