Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 12:46:50 (UTC).

ELLEN DOEREN VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION/COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 ELLEN DOEREN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION/COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8724

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOEREN ELLEN

Defendant

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION/COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEVIRIAN RICHARD C.

Defendant Attorney

MIRETSKY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

11/5/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/23/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/8/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ELLEN DOEREN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION/COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ELLEN DOEREN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ELLEN DOEREN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ELLEN DOEREN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEVIRIAN RICHARD C.