This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 20:22:57 (UTC).

ELLA OLIVERAS VS JAYRO CARDENAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2019 ELLA OLIVERAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAYRO CARDENAS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2370

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVERAS ELLA

Defendants

CARDENAS JAYRO

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THALHEIMER BERNARD JOSEPH ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MCMAHON THOMAS MICHAEL DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

NELSON HENRY PATRICK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/3/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/10/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES 19STCV30827 AND 19STC...)

11/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES 19STCV30827 AND 19STC...)

Answer

11/12/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

11/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/14/2019

11/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/14/2019

Request for Dismissal

11/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/17/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/11/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/11/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docketat 12:19 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court order Consolidating Related Cases 19STCV30827 and 19STC...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((as to Defendant City of Los Angeles, only)); Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by State of California (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Defendant County of Los Angeles - Only); Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ella Oliveras (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THALHEIMER BERNARD J. ESQ.