This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 03:40:50 (UTC).

ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ALEJANDRO CASTRO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALEJANDRO CASTRO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT S. DRAPER, DOUGLAS W. STERN and JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1913

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT S. DRAPER

DOUGLAS W. STERN

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CASTRO ALEJANDRO

LEON JUAN

OLYMPIC PALLETS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECKER ERICK J

Defendant Attorneys

NOLAN PAUL JAMES

BHAKTA ANKIT H.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/19/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/28/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 05/04/2023

5/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 05/04/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

5/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

2/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ZACHARIAH R. TOMLIN RE OSC REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

2/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ZACHARIAH R. TOMLIN RE OSC REGARDING ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/23/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

2/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S CASE SUMMARY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEN MCCORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

2/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEN MCCORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ZACHARIAH R. TOMLIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

2/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ZACHARIAH R. TOMLIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT; HEARING ON EX PARTE...)

11/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT; HEARING ON EX PARTE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO DEFEN...)

11/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO DEFEN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT ALEJANDRO CASTRO AND DECLARATION OF ZACHARIAH R. TOMLIN AND EXHIBITS THERETO

11/15/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT ALEJANDRO CASTRO AND DECLARATION OF ZACHARIAH R. TOMLIN AND EXHIBITS THERETO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

5/23/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

6/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

6/15/2022: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • Hearing06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Failure to Enter Default Judgment scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 05/04/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78 updated: Result Date to 05/04/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/04/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Zachariah R. Tomlin Re OSC Regarding Entry of Default Judgment and Request for Continuance; Filed by: ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEJANDRO CASTRO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: OLYMPIC PALLETS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: OLYMPIC PALLETS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/16/2021; Service Cost: 136.55; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: OLYMPIC PALLETS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert S. Draper in Department 78 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEJANDRO CASTRO (Defendant); JUAN LEON (Defendant); OLYMPIC PALLETS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEJANDRO CASTRO (Defendant); JUAN LEON (Defendant); OLYMPIC PALLETS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ELIZABETH'S FOOD CO., INC., A California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ALEJANDRO CASTRO (Defendant); JUAN LEON (Defendant); OLYMPIC PALLETS, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less