This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 01:44:22 (UTC).

ELIZABETH TORBATI, ET AL. VS TORRANCE CERTIFIED FARMERS' MARKET, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2022 ELIZABETH TORBATI, filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against TORRANCE CERTIFIED FARMERS' MARKET,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1516

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORBATI ELIZABETH

TORBATI ZORYA

Defendants

CITY OF TORRANCE

TORRANCE CERTIFIED FARMERS' MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HABBAS SAMER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/19/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

12/20/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

12/27/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Elizabeth Torbati (Plaintiff); Zorya Torbati (Plaintiff); As to: Torrance Certified Farmers' Market (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Elizabeth Torbati (Plaintiff),Zorya Torbati (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 12/27/2022 ; As To Parties changed from City of Torrance (Defendant), Torrance Certified Farmers' Market (Defendant) to Torrance Certified Farmers' Market (Defendant), City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Elizabeth Torbati, et al. on 12/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Elizabeth Torbati and Zorya Torbati as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default scheduled for 04/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elizabeth Torbati (Plaintiff); Zorya Torbati (Plaintiff); As to: Torrance Certified Farmers' Market (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elizabeth Torbati (Plaintiff); Zorya Torbati (Plaintiff); As to: Torrance Certified Farmers' Market (Defendant); City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less