*******8342
08/02/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Other Real Property
Los Angeles, California
MAURICE A. LEITER
REYES LEOPOLDO
SALAS MONTEALEGRE ELIZABETH
AMDIAK LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
LUSK GRAY
MAXIMUM REALTY & PROPERTY MGT. A CALIFORNIA ENTITY BUSINESS FORM UNKNOWN
MOSES ARTOOR
MUOTO MARTIN
SOLA IMPACT FUND II GP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
SOLA IMPACT FUND II LP A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
SOLA RENTALS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
SOLA RENTALS QOZB LLC
ERSOFF VICTORIA L.
CIMINELLI CRISTINA MARIA
GRECO VICKI
TARNEJA ANKUR
1/24/2023: Request for Dismissal
1/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VICTORIA L. ERSOFF RE FUNDING OF CALABLE ACCOUNT
1/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE...)
1/13/2023: Notice of Ruling
12/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; HEARING ON...) OF 12/16/2022
12/16/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SEAL ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF A PENDING CLAIM OR ACTION DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR CHILD MELANY YATSIRY REYES
12/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MIS
12/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE; HEARING ON...)
12/16/2022: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM
12/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO SEAL
12/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STIPULATION TO SEAL PETITIONS FOR COMPROMISE OF A PENDING CLAIM OR ACTION FOR MINOR CHILDREN AND ORDERS APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION
11/29/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SEAL PETITIONS FOR COMPROMISE OF A PENDING CLAIM OR ACTION FOR MINOR CHILDREN AND ORDERS APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSI
11/29/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO SEAL PETITIONS FOR COMPROMISE OF A PENDING CLAIM OR ACTION FOR MINOR CHILDREN AND ORDERS APPROVING COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JU
11/22/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
11/22/2022: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
11/22/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VICTORIA L. ERSOFF IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONS FOR COMPROMISE OF A PENDING CLAIM OR ACTION FOR MINOR CHILDREN
11/22/2022: Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL SETTLEMENT AMOUNTS RELATED TO THE PETITION TO APPROVE THE COMPROMISE OF A PENDING ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CRISTINA M. CIMINELLI
11/21/2022: Notice of Settlement
DocketOn the Complaint filed by Elizabeth Salas Montealegre, et al. on 08/02/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Elizabeth Salas Montealegre, Kevin Giovany Reyes, Melany Yatsiry Reyes, and Leopoldo Reyes as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Elizabeth Salas Montealegre (Plaintiff); Kevin Giovany Reyes (Plaintiff); Melany Yatsiry Reyes (Plaintiff); Leopoldo Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Sola Impact Fund II, LP, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sola Impact Fund II GP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sola Rentals, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF VICTORIA L. ERSOFF RE FUNDING OF CALABLE ACCOUNT; Filed by: Elizabeth Salas Montealegre (Plaintiff); Kevin Giovany Reyes (Plaintiff); Melany Yatsiry Reyes (Plaintiff); Leopoldo Reyes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketJury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2023
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Elizabeth Salas Montealegre (Plaintiff); Kevin Giovany Reyes (Plaintiff); Melany Yatsiry Reyes (Plaintiff); Leopoldo Reyes (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketAddress for Victoria L. Ersoff (Attorney) updated
[-] Read LessDocketAddress for Philip Shakhnis (Attorney) updated
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Elizabeth Salas Montealegre (Plaintiff); Kevin Giovany Reyes (Plaintiff); Melany Yatsiry Reyes (Plaintiff); Leopoldo Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Sola Impact Fund II, LP, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sola Impact Fund II GP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sola Rentals, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elizabeth Salas Montealegre (Plaintiff); Kevin Giovany Reyes (Plaintiff); Melany Yatsiry Reyes (Plaintiff); Leopoldo Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Sola Impact Fund II, LP, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sola Impact Fund II GP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Sola Rentals, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Kevin: Status Date changed from 09/22/2021 to 08/02/2021
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Melany: Status Date changed from 09/21/2021 to 08/02/2021
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read LessCase Number: *******8342 Hearing Date: December 16, 2022 Dept: 54
Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles | |||
Elizabeth Salas Montealegre, et al., |
Plaintiffs, |
Case No.:
|
*******8342 |
vs. |
|
Tentative Ruling
| |
Sola Impact Fund II, LP, et al., |
Defendants. |
|
|
|
|
|
|
Hearing Date: December 16, 2022
Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter
Motion to Seal
(2) Petitions for Minor’s Compromise
T/R: THE MOTION TO SEAL IS GRANTED.
THE PETITIONS ARE GRANTED.
PLAINTIFFS TO NOTICE.
If the parties wish to submit on the tentative, please email the courtroom at SMCdept54@lacourt.org with notice to opposing counsel (or self-represented party) before 8:30 am on the day of the hearing.
The Court considers the moving papers. No opposition has been received.
A. Motion to Seal
The court may order that a record be filed under seal only if it expressly finds facts that establish: (1) There exists an overriding interest that overcomes the right of public access to the record; (2) The overriding interest supports sealing the record; (3) A substantial probability exists that the overriding interest will be prejudiced if the record is not sealed; (4) The proposed sealing is narrowly tailored; and (5) No less restrictive means exist to achieve the overriding interest.” (CRC Rule 2.550(d).) “The motion or application must be accompanied by a memorandum and a declaration containing facts sufficient to justify the sealing.” (CRC Rule 2.551(b)(1).)
The Sola Defendants move to seal the amount of the settlement between the Sola Defendants and Plaintiffs. Defendants assert that the parties agreed the settlement amount would be confidential. This overrides the public’s interest in the settlement amount. Defendants have satisfied the requirements of the rule.
The motion to seal is GRANTED.
B. Petitions for Minor’s Compromise
Compromises of disputed claims brought by minors are governed in part by CCP 372. The statute allows a guardian ad litem to appear in court on behalf of a minor claimant and gives the guardian ad litem the power to compromise the minor’s claim “with the approval of the court in which the action or proceeding is pending.” A petition for court approval of a compromise must be verified by the petitioner and must contain a full disclosure of all information that has any bearing upon the reasonableness of the compromise or covenant. (CRC Rule 7.950.)
CRC Rule 7.952(a) requires the attendance of the petitioner and claimant at the hearing on the compromise of the claim unless the court for good causes dispenses with their personal appearance.
“Neither section 372 nor the California Rules of Court (rules 7.950 & 7.952) contemplates a noticed motion and adversary hearing when court approval of a minor's compromise is sought. Although we need not decide the question, it would appear that a petition to approve or disapprove a minor's compromise may be decided by the superior court, ex parte, in chambers.” (Pearson v. Superior Court (2012) 202 Cal. App. 4th 1333, 1337.)
Petitioners seek court approval for a settlement from the Sola Defendants under which minor claimants each would receive 8.5% of the total settlement. 30% will be deducted for attorneys’ fees. The settlement funds will be placed in CalAble accounts.
This is a landlord-tenant action involving allegations of uninhabitable conditions. Having reviewed the petition, the Court finds that the individual settlements are fair in light alleged injuries sustained by claimants. The Court finds the attorney’s fees reasonable.
The petitions are GRANTED.
Case Number: *******8342 Hearing Date: November 9, 2022 Dept: 54
Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles | |||
Elizabeth Salas Montealegre, et al., |
Plaintiffs, |
Case No.:
|
*******8342 |
vs. |
|
Tentative Ruling
| |
Sola Impact Fund II, LP, et al., |
Defendants. |
|
|
|
|
|
|
Hearing Date: November 9, 2022
Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter
Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement
Moving Party: Defendants Artoor Moses, Maximum Realty & Property, and Amdiak LLC
Responding Party: None
T/R: DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO FOR APPROVAL OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED.
DEFENDANTS TO NOTICE.
If the parties wish to submit on the tentative, please email the courtroom at SMCdept54@lacourt.org with notice to opposing counsel (or self-represented party) before 8:00 am on the day of the hearing.
The Court considers the moving papers.[1]
Any party to an action in which it is alleged that two or more parties are joint tortfeasors or co-obligors on a contract debt shall be entitled to a hearing on the issue of the good faith of a settlement entered into by the plaintiff or other claimant and one or more alleged tortfeasors or co-obligors upon giving notice in the manner provided in Code of Civil Procedure, section 1005(b). (CCP 877.6(a)(1).) A determination by the court that the settlement was made in good faith shall bar any other joint tortfeasor or co-obligor from any further claims against the settling tortfeasor or co-obligor for equitable comparative contribution, or partial or comparative indemnity, based on comparative negligence or comparative fault. (CCP 877.6 (c).) The party contesting the settlement bears the burden of proving that the settlement is in bad faith. (CCP 877.6 (d).)
Defendants Artoor Moses, Maximum Realty & Property, and Amdiak LLC
apply for approval of their good faith settlement with Plaintiffs. The parties engaged in settlement negotiations via mediation; Defendants agreed to settle with Plaintiffs for their insurance policy limit of $100,000. Defendants admit no fault but state the settlement is proportionate to their potential share of liability. There is no challenge the settlement. The Court finds that the settlement is in good faith.
The application is GRANTED.
[1] Defendants Sola Impact Fund II, LP, Sola Impact Fund II GP, Sola Rentals, Inc. and Sola Rentals QOZB LLC withdrew their opposition to the motion on November 4, 2022.