Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 13:16:22 (UTC).

ELIZABETH ROSA, ET AL. VS SUPREME STEEL TREATING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 ELIZABETH ROSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUPREME STEEL TREATING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9512

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSA ELIZABETH

BROWN A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM ELIZABETH ROSA AYDEN

Defendants

SUPREME STEEL TREATING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM YOON S.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

5/23/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by ELIZABETH ROSA (Plaintiff); AYDEN BROWN a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, ELIZABETH ROSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ELIZABETH ROSA (Plaintiff); AYDEN BROWN a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, ELIZABETH ROSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ELIZABETH ROSA (Plaintiff); AYDEN BROWN a minor by and through his Guardian ad Litem, ELIZABETH ROSA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less