This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 03:20:08 (UTC).

ELIZABETH RIVAS VS LINDA TISCARENO

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 ELIZABETH RIVAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LINDA TISCARENO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3933

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RIVAS ELIZABETH

Defendants and Respondents

TISCARENO LINDA

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HANASSAB FRED F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/7/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/7/2017: SUMMONS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/29/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

3/5/2019: Declaration

Unknown

12/14/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/19/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by LINDA TISCARENO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Fred Hanassab Re Continuance of Trial Setting Conference date and OSC date re: Failure to File Proof of Service); Filed by ELIZABETH RIVAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ELIZABETH RIVAS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3933    Hearing Date: March 26, 2021    Dept: 29

Rivas  v.  Tiscareno

Court Order Re: Continuance of the March 26, 2021 Hearing to April 13, 2021;

On the Court's own motion, the Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Defendant's Form Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Counsel; Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Defendant's Special Interrogatories (Set One); Requests for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Counsel;  Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Demand for Production (Set One); Requests for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and/or Plaintiff's Counsel scheduled for 03/26/2021 are continued to 04/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at Spring Street Courthouse.

Counsel for the Moving Party(ies) is ordered to give notice and file proof of service of said notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANASSAB FRED F. ESQ.