This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 00:16:06 (UTC).

ELIZABETH LUTZ VS DOE 1, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 ELIZABETH LUTZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3151

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUTZ ELIZABETH

Defendants

STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY

ALBERTSON'S LLC

THE VONS COMPANIES INC.

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB HOLDINGS LLC

STARBUCKS HOLDING COMPANY

ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC

STARBUCKS CORPORATION

ALBERTSONS INVESTOR HOLDINGS LLC

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB LLC

DOE 1 AKA "CANDACE" N/A

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

STARBUCKS COFFEE INTERNATIONAL INC.

VONS REIT INC.

ALBERTSONS MANAGEMENT HOLDCO LLC

ALBERTSON'S HOLDINGS LLC

NEW ALBERTSONS L.P. DOE 21

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M.

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

12/16/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

12/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/19/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/19/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/16/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/16/2019: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal); Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Docketat 10:48 AM in Department 5; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement) of 12/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elizabeth Lutz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albertson's Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STARBUCKS HOLDING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSONS STORES, LLP is a litigant