This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 16:28:03 (UTC).

ELIZABETH KO VS BRIEANNA PEACOCK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 ELIZABETH KO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BRIEANNA PEACOCK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1520

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KO ELIZABETH

Defendants

PEACOCK BRIEANNA

PEACOCK CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK ALEXANDER C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/18/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Request for Dismissal

8/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ELIZABETH KO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ELIZABETH KO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ELIZABETH KO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ELIZABETH KO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK ALEXANDER C.