This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 00:11:05 (UTC).

ELIZABETH JOHNSON ET AL VS PETER A MYERS ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2017 ELIZABETH JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PETER A MYERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8349

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Minors and Guardian Ad Litems

PEREZ-OVALLE SELENE ISABEL

ARCE JOSE

JOHNSON ELIZABETH

HICKS CHRISTAL

ARCE NATALIA

RANDALL CHRISTIAN

Defendants

MYERS PETER A. - TRUSTEE OF THE

CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

HERSHMAN MICHAEL W.

HERSHMAN CAROLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

GREEN MICHAEL P. ESQ.

TOFER & ASSOCIATES PLC

Defendant Attorney

EVERETT DOREY LLP

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS PETER A. MYERS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE PETER & SHERRY MYERS TRUST, MICHAEL W. HERSHMAN, CAROLE HERSHMAN AND CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., DBA M&H PROPERTIES'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAIN

6/22/2018: DEFENDANTS PETER A. MYERS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE PETER & SHERRY MYERS TRUST, MICHAEL W. HERSHMAN, CAROLE HERSHMAN AND CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., DBA M&H PROPERTIES'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAIN

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

6/22/2018: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

Unknown

6/22/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9/21/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Request for Dismissal

4/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

12/27/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Elizabeth Johnson (Plaintiff); Jose Arce (Plaintiff); Selene Isabel Perez-Ovalle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Stipulation and Order ([PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT)); Filed by Myers, Peter A. - Trustee of the (Defendant); Michael W. Hershman (Defendant); Carole Hershman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elizabeth Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elizabeth Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elizabeth Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DEFENDANTS PETER A. MYERS, AS TRUSTEE OF THE PETER & SHERRY MYERS TRUST, MICHAEL W. HERSHMAN, CAROLE HERSHMAN AND CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, INC., DBA M&H PROPERTIES'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Myers, Peter A. - Trustee of the (Defendant); Michael W. Hershman (Defendant); Carole Hershman (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Myers, Peter A. - Trustee of the (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Myers, Peter A. - Trustee of the (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Elizabeth Johnson (Plaintiff); Jose Arce (Plaintiff); Selene Isabel Perez-Ovalle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC688349    Hearing Date: January 08, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ELIZABETH JOHNSON, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

PETER A. MYERS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC688349

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 8, 2020

Defendants have noticed the depositions of Plaintiffs on numerous occasions. Most recently, Defendant scheduled the depositions for 9/23/19. No plaintiff appeared. The Court, on 11/05/19, granted motions to compel the depositions of Christian Randall, Julian Arce, and Analy Escobar. At issue today are the depositions of Christal Hicks, Elizabeth Johnson, Selene Isabel Perez-Ovalle, Natalia Arce, and Jose Arce.

At this time, Defendant moves to compel the above-named plaintiffs’ depositions. The motions to compel are unopposed and granted. CCP §2025.450(a). Plaintiffs are ordered to appear for deposition at a date, time, and location to be noticed by Defendants. Defendants must give at least ten days’ notice of the depositions (notice extended per Code if by other than personal service).

Defendants seek sanctions in connection with the motions. Sanctions are mandatory. §2025.480(j). Defense Counsel bills at the rate of $210/hour. The Court awards one hour to appear at the missed deposition, one hour to meet and confer, and one hour to prepare each motion to compel. No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary. The Court awards three hours to appear at the hearing. The Court therefore awards a total of ten hours of attorney time at the rate of $210/hour, or $2100 in attorneys’ fees. The Court awards six court reporter fees of $497.40 (Perez-Ovalle), $573.25 (Johnson), $471.85 (Hicks), $496.95 (Natalia Arce), and $500.90 (Jose Arce); deposition fees are awarded in the total amount of $2540.35. The Court awards six filing fees of $60 each, for a total of $360 in filing fees.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiffs and their attorneys of record, jointly and severally. They are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendants, by and through their attorney of record, in the amount of $5000.35, within twenty days.

Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC688349    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ELIZABETH JOHNSON, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

PETER A. MYERS, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC688349

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 5, 2019

Defendants have noticed the depositions of Plaintiffs, Christian Randall, Julian Arce, and Analy Escobar on numerous occasions. Mostly recently, Defendant scheduled the depositions for 9/23/19. Neither Plaintiff not any of the three plaintiffs appeared for the scheduled depositions.

At this time, Defendant moves to compel Plaintiffs’ depositions. The motions to compel are unopposed and granted. CCP §2025.450(a). Plaintiffs are ordered to appear for deposition at a date, time, and location to be noticed by Defendant. Defendant must give at least ten days’ notice of the depositions (notice extended per Code if by other than personal service).

Defendant seeks sanctions in connection with the motions. Sanctions are mandatory. §2025.480(j). Defense Counsel bills at the rate of $210/hour. The Court awards one hour to appear at the missed deposition, one hour to meet and confer, and one hour to prepare each motion to compel. No opposition was filed and therefore no reply was necessary. The Court awards three hours to appear at the hearing. The Court therefore awards a total of six hours of attorney time at the rate of $210/hour, or $1260 in attorneys’ fees. The Court awards three court reporter fees of $488.20 each, and three filing fees of $60 each, for a total of $1644.60 in costs.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiffs and their attorneys of record, jointly and severally. They are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendants, by and through their attorney of record, in the amount of $2904.60, within twenty days.

Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.