This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 18:49:27 (UTC).

ELIZABETH JODEAN DICKSON TRUST DATED JULY 21,2020

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 ELIZABETH JODEAN DICKSON TRUST DATED JULY 21,2020 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8494

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WATERS CHRISTOPHER ANDREW

Not Classified By Court

ELIZABETH JODEAN DICKSON TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SALVO ALICE A.

 

Court Documents

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order Determining Title to Trust Assets

8/31/2021: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) - Petition for Order Determining Title to Trust Assets

Notice - Hearing

9/21/2021: Notice - Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trust 17200 Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition for Order Determining Title to Trust Assets ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALVO ALICE A.