This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2022 at 11:25:42 (UTC).

ELIZABETH GONZALEZ VS U.S. BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 ELIZABETH GONZALEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against U S BANK, N A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0694

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ELIZABETH

Defendant

U.S. BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA ANTHONY P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION TO COMPLAINT

9/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION TO COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ELIZABETH GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. BANK, N.A. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/29/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ELIZABETH GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. BANK, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ELIZABETH GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. BANK, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ELIZABETH GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. BANK, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICATION TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: ELIZABETH GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); As to: U.S. BANK, N.A. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.