This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2023 at 04:00:46 (UTC).

ELIZABETH DABDA VS AMERICAN GOLDEN TRUCKING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 ELIZABETH DABDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMERICAN GOLDEN TRUCKING, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1621

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DABDA ELIZABETH

Defendants

AMERICAN GOLDEN TRUCKING INC.

MOSTAFA DARZI MAGHSOUDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALLES MEGAN

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN MICHAEL GUY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/11/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/28/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/28/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/25/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/19/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/1/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/1/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/30/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/30/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/9/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/9/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2024
  • Hearing07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2023
  • Hearing12/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: American Golden Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Darzi Maghsoudi Mostafa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Golden Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Darzi Maghsoudi Mostafa (Defendant); As to: Elizabeth Dabda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Elizabeth Dabda on 07/05/2022, Default entered on 01/30/2023, Vacated - Stipulation granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Elizabeth Dabda on 07/05/2022, Default entered on 01/30/2023, Vacated - Stipulation to vacate granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Withdraw Request for Entry of Default; Signed and Filed by: American Golden Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Darzi Maghsoudi Mostafa (Defendant); As to: Elizabeth Dabda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Withdraw Request for Entry of Default: Filed By: Darzi Maghsoudi Mostafa (Defendant),American Golden Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Withdraw Request for Entry of Default; Signed and Filed by: American Golden Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Darzi Maghsoudi Mostafa (Defendant); As to: Elizabeth Dabda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elizabeth Dabda (Plaintiff); As to: American Golden Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Darzi Maghsoudi Mostafa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elizabeth Dabda (Plaintiff); As to: American Golden Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Darzi Maghsoudi Mostafa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less