This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 08:28:18 (UTC).

ELIZABETH BARRERA, ET AL. VS GENESIS ZEPEDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 ELIZABETH BARRERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GENESIS ZEPEDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6955

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARRERA ELIZABETH

OCHOA CARMELA

Defendants

ZEPEDA GENESIS

ZEPEDA LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KREIT THEODORE IRVING

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2024
  • Hearing10/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elizabeth Barrera (Plaintiff); Carmela Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elizabeth Barrera (Plaintiff); Carmela Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Elizabeth Barrera (Plaintiff); Carmela Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KREIT THEODORE