Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 03:30:38 (UTC).

ELITA GALIAMOVA VS JASMIN MARIE MALDONADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 ELITA GALIAMOVA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JASMIN MARIE MALDONADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8636

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALIAMOVA ELITA

Defendants

MALDONADO JASMIN MARIE

CARMONA MARIA SELMA

ANTHONY SOTO JOHN PAUL

MALDONADO HENRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BANAFSHE P. RYAN

Defendant Attorneys

ARABYAN LILIT

BREMER KEITH G.

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/4/2021: Answer

Answer

1/25/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/28/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/31/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • Hearing12/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Hearing06/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Hearing06/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JASMIN MARIE MALDONADO (Defendant); MARIA SELMA CARMONA (Defendant); HENRY MALDONADO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JOHN PAUL ANTHONY SOTO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ELITA GALIAMOVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ELITA GALIAMOVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ELITA GALIAMOVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ELITA GALIAMOVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ELITA GALIAMOVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ELITA GALIAMOVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ELITA GALIAMOVA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARABYAN LILIT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREMER KEITH