Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 02:32:12 (UTC).

ELISABETH PARRON VS THE KROGER CO., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 ELISABETH PARRON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2784

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARRON ELISABETH

Defendants

THE KROGER CO. A CORPORATION

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELIE ERIK STEPHEN

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/15/2021: PI General Order

Answer

5/6/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alpha Beta Company dba Ralphs Erroneously Sued As RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ELISABETH PARRON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ELISABETH PARRON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ELISABETH PARRON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELIE ERIK S.