This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 07:36:34 (UTC).

ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL. VS CARMEN LIKA VAIVAO, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARMEN LIKA VAIVAO, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4406

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF WEST LOS ANGELES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

VAIVAO AN INDIVIDUAL CARMEN LIKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINETT TIMOTHY D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

1/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

1/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • Hearing08/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order); Filed by Eli's Collision Repair of South Bay, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Eli's Collision Repair of West Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Eli's Collision Repair of South Bay, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Eli's Collision Repair of West Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Eli's Collision Repair of South Bay, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Eli's Collision Repair of West Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eli's Collision Repair of South Bay, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Eli's Collision Repair of West Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eli's Collision Repair of South Bay, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Eli's Collision Repair of West Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eli's Collision Repair of South Bay, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Eli's Collision Repair of West Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eli's Collision Repair of South Bay, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Eli's Collision Repair of West Los Angeles, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELI'S COLLISION REPAIR OF SOUTH BAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBINETT, TIMOTHY D.