This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 20:58:41 (UTC).

ELINA NERSESOVA VS EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 ELINA NERSESOVA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2103

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NERSESOVA ELINA

Defendants

EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON

FRIAS MARY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARDANYAN RUBEN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/30/2021: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/27/2021: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

9/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Elina Nersesova on 08/30/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Elina Nersesova as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elina Nersesova (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton (Defendant); Mary Ann Frias (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elina Nersesova (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton (Defendant); Mary Ann Frias (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elina Nersesova (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton (Defendant); Mary Ann Frias (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less