This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2020 at 00:32:03 (UTC).

ELIN BYRD, ET AL. VS GROOMINGDALES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 ELIN BYRD, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GROOMINGDALES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5510

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLVILLE ZELDA

BYRD ELIN

Defendants

BENDIG JAMES A.

BENDIG JOANNE M.

GROOMINGDALES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALDO WILLIAM S.

Defendant Attorney

KHOURY ZAHRA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

7/22/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/22/2020

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/20/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Order - ORDER TO THE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

3/10/2020: Order - ORDER TO THE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER

3/10/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2020

3/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/10/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

2/5/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ZAHRA KHOURY IN SUPPORT

1/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ZAHRA KHOURY IN SUPPORT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/27/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT INITIAL PLEADING) PORTIONS OF VERIFIED COMPLAINT

1/27/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT INITIAL PLEADING) PORTIONS OF VERIFIED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

1/27/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint; Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Settlement) of 07/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by William S. Waldo (Attorney); Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by William S. Waldo (Attorney); Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by William S. Waldo (Attorney); Elin Byrd (Plaintiff); Zelda Colville (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALDO WILLIAM S.