This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 09:30:03 (UTC).

ELIAS FERNANDEZ VS THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; AND DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 ELIAS FERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE BICYCLE CASINO, L P , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AND DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6127

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERNANDEZ ELIAS

Defendants

THE BICYCLE CASINO L.P. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; AND DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

THE BICYCLE CASINO L.P. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVELY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RICARDO

Defendant Attorney

AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/16/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

2/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/12/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/10/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Bicycle Casino, L.P., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by The Bicycle Casino, L.P., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Elias Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Elias Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elias Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Elias Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elias Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elias Fernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT