This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2020 at 02:53:02 (UTC).

ELENITA CRISTOBAL ET AL VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 ELENITA CRISTOBAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY MTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6226

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

CRISTOBAL ELENITA

CRISTOBAL JANELLE

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPOS-

DOES 1 TO 25

BLANCHARD MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RICHARDSON GAIL W.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CUETO JUAN JOSE

WEND CHRISTOPHER P

Cross Defendant Attorney

DIARIAN GREG

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

4/15/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

1/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

1/6/2020: Notice of Settlement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/10/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling

12/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/26/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/11/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Cross-Complaint

11/20/2018: Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

11/21/2018: Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

Answer

11/21/2018: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/30/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

5/9/2019: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

5/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Answer

5/15/2019: Answer

Request for Refund / Order

5/17/2019: Request for Refund / Order

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE: COVID-19) of 04/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order RE: COVID-19)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Elenita Cristobal (Plaintiff); Janelle Cristobal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Elenita Cristobal (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Elenita Cristobal (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elenita Cristobal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elenita Cristobal (Plaintiff); Janelle Cristobal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706226    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Greg Diarian, Esq. of Raffalow, Bretoi, Lutz & Stele seeks to be relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Elenita Cristobal in her capacity as Cross-Defendant because counsel was originally assigned by Ms. Cristobal’s insurer, who has determined that there is no coverage available for the cross-complaint and will not provide representation for Ms. Cristobal as a cross-defendant. Ms. Cristobal is still represented by the Law Offices of John C. Ye in her capacity as Plaintiff. No party opposed.

Absent a showing of resulting prejudice, an attorney’s request for withdrawal should be granted. (People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398, 406.) Counsel’s Motion complies with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362. The Court notes that trial in this matter is currently set for Feb. 19, 2020 and no prejudice will result from granting this motion. Accordingly, this unopposed motion to be relieved is GRANTED and effective upon filing a proof of service showing service of this Order on Ms. Cristobal and all parties who have appeared.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.