Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2021 at 23:06:48 (UTC).

ELENA DIAZ GONZALEZ VS CHEVIOT HILLS SENIOR LIVING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 ELENA DIAZ GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHEVIOT HILLS SENIOR LIVING, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0392

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ GONZALEZ ELENA

Defendants

CHEVIOT HILLS SENIOR LIVING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

OASIS OUTSOURCING III INC A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorneys

MELTON FRANK E

FLORES HEIDY AIDEE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/11/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/21/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

10/21/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by CHEVIOT HILLS SENIOR LIVING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); OASIS OUTSOURCING III, INC, a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Elena Diaz Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CHEVIOT HILLS SENIOR LIVING, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); OASIS OUTSOURCING III, INC, a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elena Diaz Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Elena Diaz Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elena Diaz Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elena Diaz Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OASIS OUTSOURCING III INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANITZ ERIC A.