This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2019 at 00:39:14 (UTC).

ELEANOR MURACA VS MICHAEL ABRAHAM ALEMAN M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by ELEANOR MURACA against MICHAEL ABRAHAM ALEMAN M D in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8620

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MURACA ELEANOR

Defendants and Respondents

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL

ALEMAN MICHAEL ABRAHAM M.D.

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NASMYTH PETER R. JR.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GONZALEZ MICHAEL D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/10/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGUEZ, CSR N. 13269

8/19/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGUEZ, CSR N. 13269

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION - O...) OF 08/19/2019

8/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HEARING ON MOTION - O...) OF 08/19/2019

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS

8/14/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/5/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN PAUL FRUEHAUF

8/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN PAUL FRUEHAUF

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

8/5/2019: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/08/2019

8/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/08/2019

Request for Judicial Notice

7/9/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

7/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Motion for Summary Judgment

4/24/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT Y. RHOTEN AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT Y. RHOTEN AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

4/24/2019: Separate Statement

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

6/20/2019: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

Declaration - of Trial Attorney for Defendants Michael Abraham Aleman, M.D., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Southern California Permanente Medical Group

7/18/2018: Declaration - of Trial Attorney for Defendants Michael Abraham Aleman, M.D., Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., Kaiser Foundation Hospitals and Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Answer - MICHAEL ABRAHAM ALEMAN, M.D.; KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.; KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP.

7/18/2018: Answer - MICHAEL ABRAHAM ALEMAN, M.D.; KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.; KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS; SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP.

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

7/18/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

7/2/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • Hearing06/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Hearing03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing03/05/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Michael Abraham M.D. Aleman (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (MOTION TO SUBSTITITE JANET PACELLI IN PLACE OF DECEASED PLAINTIFF, ELEANOR MURACA;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Motion - O...) of 08/19/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Cesar Rodriguez, CSR N. 13269); Filed by Michael Abraham M.D. Aleman (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Michael Abraham M.D. Aleman (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eleanor Muraca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eleanor Muraca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Eleanor Muraca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eleanor Muraca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708620    Hearing Date: March 23, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION

Ex parte granted. Trial is continued to Oct. 1, 2020.  FSC is continued to Sept. 17, 2020.  All dates are based on the new trial date.  The parties are to inform all witnesses and experts of the new trial date.  Parties who intend to submit on this tentative should send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.  Parties who submit do not need to appear.  Any party intending to file an opposition to the ex parte application shall, in addition to filing the opposition, email the opposition to SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org by March 23, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.  If a party intends to appear, the Court STRONGLY ENCOURAGES counsel to appear via Court Call.