This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2022 at 03:20:34 (UTC).

ELEANOR J BARRAZA VS UNIVERSAL STUDIOS HOLLYWOOD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 ELEANOR J BARRAZA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against UNIVERSAL STUDIOS HOLLYWOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0770

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRAZA ELEANOR J

Defendants

UNIVERSAL THEME PARKS

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC DBA UNIVERSAL STUDIOS HOLLYWOOD

COMCAST

NBC UNIVERSAL

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS THEME PARKS

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS INC

UNIVERSAL PARKS AND RESORTS

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC

COMCAST NBC UNIVERSAL

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS HOLLYWOOD

UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LTD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/18/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/18/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/2/2021: PI General Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 09/15/2022

9/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 09/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

9/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

9/15/2022: Order - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 09/15/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eleanor J Barraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eleanor J Barraza (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL PARKS & RESORTS is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL STUDIOS HOLLYWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL CITY DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LTD., a Florida limited partnership d.b.a. Universal Orlando Resort is a litigant