This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 02:27:39 (UTC).

ELDON BLUITT, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SUPER CENTER CONCEPTS, INC. DBA SUPERIOR GROCERS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 ELDON BLUITT, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SUPER CENTER CONCEPTS, INC DBA SUPERIOR GROCERS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1047

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUITT AN INDIVIDUAL ELDON

Defendants

COCA-COLA REFRESHMENTS USA INC.

REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING

REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING LLC

REYES HOLDINGS LLC

SUPER CENTER CONCEPTS INC. DBA SUPERIOR GROCERS

THE COCA-COLA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORTON GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/2/2022: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

1/4/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Eldon Bluitt, an individual on 11/02/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Eldon Bluitt, an individual as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Eldon Bluitt, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eldon Bluitt, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Super Center Concepts, Inc. dba Superior Grocers (Defendant); Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. (Defendant); The Coca-Cola Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eldon Bluitt, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Super Center Concepts, Inc. dba Superior Grocers (Defendant); Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. (Defendant); The Coca-Cola Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eldon Bluitt, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Super Center Concepts, Inc. dba Superior Grocers (Defendant); Coca-Cola Refreshments USA, Inc. (Defendant); The Coca-Cola Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPER CENTER CONCEPTS INC. DBA SUPERIOR GROCERS is a litigant

Latest cases where REYES COCA-COLA BOTTLING L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE COCA-COLA COMPANY is a litigant