This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 14:23:47 (UTC).

ELANDER BARRON VS WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 ELANDER BARRON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS ALMONDS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2782

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARRON ELANDER

Defendant

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES ROSS

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS REID P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/6/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/07/2021

1/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX DESIGNATION) OF 01/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PETITION FOR ADD-ON)

5/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PETITION FOR ADD-ON)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER COORDINATING

4/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER COORDINATING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

2/26/2021: Status Conference Statement - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Appearance

1/26/2021: Notice of Appearance

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COMPLEX LITIGATION FEE

1/26/2021: Notice - WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COMPLEX LITIGATION FEE

Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND OF ENTRY OF COURT'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

1/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND OF ENTRY OF COURT'S INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Petition for Add-on) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Petition for Add-on)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Coordinating); Filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 4:26 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketJoint Initial Status Conference Statement; Filed by Elander Barron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketWonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC's notice of payment of complex litigation fee; Filed by Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elander Barron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Initial Status Conference and of Entry of Court's Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Elander Barron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 3:28 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Complex Designation) of 01/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Complex Designation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elander Barron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elander Barron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, REID P