This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2022 at 05:13:31 (UTC).

ELAINE REYES-REYNAGA VS AMANECER COMMUNITY COUNSELING SERVICE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 ELAINE REYES-REYNAGA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against AMANECER COMMUNITY COUNSELING SERVICE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5715

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES-REYNAGA ELAINE

Defendants

AMANECER COMMUNITY COUNSELING SERVICE

CARDENAS ALICE

VALENZUELA TEDDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/10/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/21/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/30/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elaine Reyes-Reynaga (Plaintiff); As to: Alice Cardenas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 146.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Elaine Reyes-Reynaga (Plaintiff); As to: Teddie Valenzuela (Defendant); Service Date: 11/20/2022; Service Cost: 104.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Elaine Reyes-Reynaga (Plaintiff); As to: Amanecer Community Counseling Service (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/14/2022; Service Cost: 145.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Elaine Reyes-Reynaga (Plaintiff); As to: Amanecer Community Counseling Service (Defendant); Teddie Valenzuela (Defendant); Alice Cardenas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Elaine Reyes-Reynaga (Plaintiff); As to: Amanecer Community Counseling Service (Defendant); Teddie Valenzuela (Defendant); Alice Cardenas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Elaine Reyes-Reynaga (Plaintiff); As to: Amanecer Community Counseling Service (Defendant); Teddie Valenzuela (Defendant); Alice Cardenas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMANECER COMMUNITY COUNSELING SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R