This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 02:54:27 (UTC).

ELAINE MARIE GUERRERO ET AL VS SARINANA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 ELAINE MARIE GUERRERO filed an Other lawsuit against SARINANA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0847

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORRALES CHRISTOPHER

GUERRERO ELAINE MARIE

GUERRERO ALYSSA

GUERRERO HENRY R. JR.

Defendants

MEZA ROMAN ARIEL

SARINANA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDEN JAMES A. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SPILE SIEGAL LEFF & GOOR LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. ANDROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S NOTICE OF HEARING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/19/2018: DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. ANDROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S NOTICE OF HEARING OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF ANDREW LEFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/19/2018: DECLARATION OF ANDREW LEFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

7/30/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/30/2018: DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/30/2018: DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTIVE

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTIVE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

7/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY CECILIA GUERRERO, TRUSTEE; AND 2. WRONGFULLY TAKING PERSONAL PROPERTY AND FOR AIDING AND ABETTING WRONGFUL TAKING AND DIS

6/1/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR 1. AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY CECILIA GUERRERO, TRUSTEE; AND 2. WRONGFULLY TAKING PERSONAL PROPERTY AND FOR AIDING AND ABETTING WRONGFUL TAKING AND DIS

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

RULING RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

5/10/2018: RULING RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

DEFENDANT SARINANA INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM THE COMPLAINT

5/2/2018: DEFENDANT SARINANA INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES FROM THE COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

5/2/2018: DEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

4/25/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

4/25/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order

4/12/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

4/18/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Minute Order

4/20/2018: Minute Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 51; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Elaine Marie Guerrero (Plaintiff); Christopher Corrales (Plaintiff); Alyssa Guerrero (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Sarinana, Inc (Defendant); Roman Ariel Meza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANTS SARINANA INC. AND ROMAN ARIEL MEZA'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Elaine Marie Guerrero (Plaintiff); Christopher Corrales (Plaintiff); Alyssa Guerrero (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Elaine Marie Guerrero (Plaintiff); Christopher Corrales (Plaintiff); Alyssa Guerrero (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR 1. AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY BY CECILIA GUERRERO, TRUSTEE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Elaine Marie Guerrero (Plaintiff); Christopher Corrales (Plaintiff); Alyssa Guerrero (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

Attorney or Barty withou!t Atiorney:

JAMES A. FRIEDEN (SBN 73983)

1717 FOURTH STREET 3RD FLOOR

SANTA MONICA, CA 90401

FB 1€ 201

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT (STANLEY MOSK)

Plaimifi:t: ELAINE MARIE GUERRERO; ET AL Defendanr: SARINANA, INC; ET AL

SUMMONS AND COMPLAIN

1. At the time of sarvice I was at least 18 yearsparty to this action.

2. Tserved copies of the SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCAT!ON? NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

Raul Sanchez

BC690847

3. a. Party served: SARINANA, INC. b. Person served: BIANCA VIOLENTE (Authorized Agent) 4. Address where the party was served: 8077 FLORENCE AVE SUITE 204

DOWNEY, CA 90242

5. Iserved the party: a. by personal service. OnFcb 102018 at 12:50 pm | personally delivered the documents listed in itcm 2 to the party or

person authorized to reccive scrvice of process for the party.

(1) (Business) A person at Icast 18 years of agc apparcntly in charge at the office or usual place of business of the person to be served. [ informedgeneral naturc of the papers.

6. The "Notice 1o the Person Served" (on the Summons)was 'comp.leled as follows: d. On behalf of Sarinana, Inc. under the fol/owing Code of Civil procedure section 416.10

7. Person Who Served Papers: Recoverable Cost Per OCP 1033.5(aX4XB) 8 Arturo Ruiz d. The Fee for Service was: $50.00 b. BytheBookAttorneyService. e¢. lam:(3) registered California process server 3637 Glendon Avenue Suite 203 (i) Owner Los Angeles, CA 90034 (ii) Registration No.: 5980 c. (818)445-7448 (iii) County: Los Angeles

(v) Expiration Date:

T [ o '—.— »

8. 1deéclare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the foregoing Is true and correct.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SARINANA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDEN JAMES ANTHONY