This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 01:43:44 (UTC).

ELAD RAHAMIM VS AARON COPPELSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 ELAD RAHAMIM filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against AARON COPPELSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3603

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAHAMIM ELAD

Respondents

COPPELSON AARON

NIGHTINGALE NY 1 LLC. A CORPORATION

WELLS FARGO CLEARING SERVICES LLC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILL TIMOTHY N.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD; DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. DONOVAN

11/1/2021: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD; DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. DONOVAN

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION PETITIONER'E FILING OF FINRA WAIVER LETTER PER COURT ORDER

12/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION PETITIONER'E FILING OF FINRA WAIVER LETTER PER COURT ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD) OF 12/08/2021

12/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD) OF 12/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

12/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD

11/22/2021: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA ARBITRATION AWARD

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/22/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Petitioner'e Filing of FINRA Waiver Letter Per Court Order); Filed by Elad Rahamim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 12/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (to Confirm FINRA Arbitration Award); Filed by Elad Rahamim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Elad Rahamim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elad Rahamim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPetition (Petition To Confirm FINRA Arbitration Award; Declaration of Daniel J. Donovan); Filed by Elad Rahamim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21STCP03603 Hearing Date: January 24, 2022 Dept: 52

Tentative Ruling:

Petitioner Elad Rahamim’s Petition to Confirm Financial Industry Regulatory Authority (FINRA) Arbitration Award

The petition to confirm the arbitration award is GRANTED. The award is hereby confirmed. All references to the underlying FINRA arbitration No. 20-00562 are ordered expunged from FINRA’s Central Registration Depository (CRD) records of petitioner Elad Rahamim.

b'

Case Number: 21STCP03603 Hearing Date: December 8, 2021 Dept: 52

Tentative Ruling:

\r\n\r\n

Petitioner\r\nElad Rahamim’s Petition to Confirm Financial\r\nIndustry Regulatory Authority (FINRA)\r\nArbitration Award

\r\n\r\n

Petitioner\r\ncomplied with CCP § 1285.4’s requirements for the substance of a petition to\r\nconfirm arbitration award. As to named\r\nrespondents Aaron Coppelson,\r\nNightingale NY 1 LLC, and Wells Fargo Clearing Services LLC, petitioner complied\r\nwith the requirements of CCP § 1290.4 regarding service of the petition and\r\nnotice of hearing. Respondents did not\r\noppose the petition.

\r\n\r\n

The\r\npetition, however, has one procedural defect. \r\nAs the award notes, “Unless specifically waived in writing by FINRA,\r\nparties seeking judicial confirmation of an arbitration award containing\r\nexpungement relief must name FINRA as an additional party and serve FINRA with\r\nall appropriate documents.” (Ex. 4,\r\nAward, p. 3, ¶ 1; see FINRA Rule 2080(b).)

\r\n\r\n

The\r\nhearing on the petition is hereby continued to January 24, 2021. Petitioner is ordered to either: (1)\r\nfile evidence that FINRA specifically waived its right to be named as a\r\nrespondent and be served with the petition; or (2) amend the petition to name\r\nFINRA as a respondent and serve FINRA with the petition and notice of the\r\ncontinued hearing date.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILL TIMOTHY N.