This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2020 at 14:35:18 (UTC).

EISNER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP VS CAPITAL HALL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 EISNER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAPITAL HALL PARTNERS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0210

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EISNER LLP

Defendant

CAPITAL HALL PARTNERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAPOZZOLA DAMIAN D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/27/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

7/7/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

8/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Eisner, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Eisner, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Eisner, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eisner, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eisner, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eisner, LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EISNER A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAPAZZOLA DAMIAN