Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 22:58:11 (UTC).

EILEEN VARGAS VS GTRANS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 EILEEN VARGAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GTRANS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4848

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS EILEEN

Defendants

GTRANS

DOE LUIS

CITY OF GARDENA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEOULLA DANIEL D.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

2/19/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2024
  • Hearing02/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eileen Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eileen Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eileen Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eileen Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEOULLA DANIEL D