This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 15:46:12 (UTC).

EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS VS MARINA BUSINESS CENTER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARINA BUSINESS CENTER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK H. EPSTEIN and MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7350

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK H. EPSTEIN

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDIS EILEEN SWARTZ

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MARINA BUSINESS CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NEWMARK KNIGHT FRANK VALUATION AND ADVISORY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HANKEY INVESTMENT COMPANY LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

NEWMARK KNIGHT FRANK VALUATION AND ADVISORY LLC

1-50 INCLUSIVE DOES

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEGURA JACOB NESSIM

Defendant Attorneys

AREVALO ERIC

LOCASCIO PAMELA RENEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/21/2020: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

9/1/2022: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/24/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

6/10/2022: Notice of Settlement

Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

12/13/2021: Memorandum - MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

12/13/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/15/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)

12/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE) OF 12/27/2021

12/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE) OF 12/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

1/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANTS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANTS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRERS BY DEFENDANTS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/12/2021: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRERS BY DEFENDANTS TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

11/18/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/22/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Motion for Trial Preference

11/24/2021: Motion for Trial Preference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/29/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by MARINA BUSINESS CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (re Automatic Extension to Respond); Filed by NEWMARK KNIGHT FRANK VALUATION AND ADVISORY, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Automatically Extending Parties' Meet and Confer Efforts); Filed by MARINA BUSINESS CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EILEEN SWARTZ LANDIS (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7350    Hearing Date: April 14, 2021    Dept: 32

DEPT:

32

CASE NUMBER:

*******7350

CASE NAME:

Eileen Swartz Landis v. Marina Business Center, LLC, et al.

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 32 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE WEST DISTRICT, JUDGE MARK EPSTEIN presiding in DEPT. R of the SANTA MONICA Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the case for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWMARK KNIGHT FRANK VALUATION & ADVISORY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MARINA BUSINESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HANKEY INVESTMENT COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEGURA JACOB N