This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2020 at 20:39:51 (UTC).

EILEEN STEFANOVSKI VS LUIS ROJO FERNANDES

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 EILEEN STEFANOVSKI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS ROJO FERNANDES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9695

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

STEFANOVSKI EILEEN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-30

FERNANDES LUIS ROJO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

OSTENDORF TATE BURNETT LLP

WALTON CHRISTOPHER D

TATE WAYNE PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

DONAVAN MONIQUE R

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 01, 2020) OF 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 01, 2020) OF 06/17/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 06/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 01, 2020)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JULY 01, 2020)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONIQUE E. EAGLE WITH SIGNATURES AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

3/12/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MONIQUE E. EAGLE WITH SIGNATURES AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION PURSUANT TO CCCP SECTION 3...)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION PURSUANT TO CCCP SECTION 3...)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

2/26/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP 377.31 FOR SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

2/6/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION PURSUANT TO CCP 377.31 FOR SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MONIQUE EAGLE RE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

2/6/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MONIQUE EAGLE RE SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

Declaration - DECLARATION ATTORNEY WALTON RE DEATH CERTIFICATE

2/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION ATTORNEY WALTON RE DEATH CERTIFICATE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

10/16/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Association of Attorney

10/28/2019: Association of Attorney

Answer

1/2/2019: Answer

SUMMONS -

6/12/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6/12/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • Hearing06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Hearing05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Hearing05/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 2:08 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 06/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (Motion Pursuant to CCP 377.31 for successor in interest for deceased plaintiff); Filed by Eileen Stefanovski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5; Jury Trial - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Eileen Stefanovski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Luis Rojo Fernandes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Luis Rojo Fernandes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eileen Stefanovski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709695    Hearing Date: March 04, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

eileen stefanovski,

Plaintiff,

v.

luis Rojo Fernandez,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC709695

Hearing Date: March 4, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF

Plaintiffs Eileen Stefanovski (“Decedent”) filed this action against Defendant Luis Rojo Fernandez (“Defendant”) following an automobile accident. Decedent died on November 5, 2019. Decedent’s granddaughter, Monique E. Eagle (“Successor”), seeks an order to maintain this action as Decedent’s successor in interest.

Successor served this motion by mail and email on February 6, 2020. That is not sufficient notice. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1005, subd. (b), 1010.6, subd. (a)(4).) Further, Successor’s declaration in support of the motion is not signed. Additionally, while successor and her counsel purport to have attached copies of Decedent’s death certificate to their declarations, the death certificate is not attached to the declarations on file.

Therefore, the motion is denied without prejudice. Successor shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: March 4, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court