Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 07:35:25 (UTC).

EILBRA MORAD VS SHIFT OPERATIONS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 EILBRA MORAD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHIFT OPERATIONS LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0076

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORAD EILBRA

Defendants

ALLY BANK

SHIFT OPERATIONS LLC

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDINA DANIELA N.

Defendant Attorneys

SIDRAN DAVID R.

LADI LASZLO

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/29/2021: Answer

Association of Attorney

4/30/2021: Association of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AN NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

3/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AN NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

3/15/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)

3/15/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFFS AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(D)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Shift Operations LLC (Defendant); Ally Bank (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Ally Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Shift Operations LLC (Defendant); Ally Bank (Defendant); American Contractors Indemnity Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (PLAINTIFF?S AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1780(d)); Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (Consent to Electronic Service an Notice of Electronic Service Address); Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eilbra Morad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHIFT OPERATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDINA DANIELA N.