This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2022 at 11:36:21 (UTC).

EIGHTEEN, LLC VS PATINWILTZ, PIERRE

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 EIGHTEEN, LLC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against PATINWILTZ, PIERRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOXER, DOREEN B. and STINN, JOSH FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5800

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BOXER, DOREEN B.

STINN, JOSH FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EIGHTEEN LLC

Respondent

PATINWILTZ PIERRE

Other

KOBI MOSHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HERRERA ALEJANDRO H.

 

Court Documents

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

10/19/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

10/19/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence (non-violence)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order

11/9/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/9/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - Personal WV-200

11/2/2021: Proof of Service - Personal WV-200

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

12/2/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

11/29/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

11/29/2021: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 25, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Stinn, Josh Freeman, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - FCCR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Personal WV-200 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence (non-violence); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EIGHTEEN LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERRERA ALEJANDRO H.