This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 08:19:14 (UTC).

EFREN NERI, ET AL. VS FCA US, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 EFREN NERI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7886

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NERI EFREN

NERI NARCISO

Defendants

FCA US LLC

GLENN E. THOMAS DODGE CHRYSLER JEE

GLENN E. THOMAS DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Efren Neri (Plaintiff); Narciso Neri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Efren Neri (Plaintiff); Narciso Neri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Efren Neri (Plaintiff); Narciso Neri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Efren Neri (Plaintiff); Narciso Neri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Efren Neri (Plaintiff); Narciso Neri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLENN E. THOMAS COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA