This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 00:42:28 (UTC).

EFRAIN NIETO RENDON VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 EFRAIN NIETO RENDON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3820

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENDON EFRAIN NIETO

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YANG MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

BRAR DARSHNIK

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/25/2022: Complaint

Answer

9/1/2022: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

8/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by EFRAIN NIETO RENDON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by EFRAIN NIETO RENDON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by EFRAIN NIETO RENDON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by EFRAIN NIETO RENDON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant