This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 13:35:05 (UTC).

EDWIN SOLORZANO VS ADAM GRUEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 EDWIN SOLORZANO filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ADAM GRUEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0535

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOLORZANO EDWIN

Defendants

AND 1 MEDIA

GRUEN ADAM

GRUEN CAPITAL LLC

WHOLESALE DIRECT METALS

SEA COAST ADVERTISING & MEDIA LLC

GRUEN ROGER

GREENE LINDA

PIERCE CY

GRUCO PROP LLC

GELLER NILOOFAR MOSHFEGH

PALAZZO MARC

GRUEN AMANDA

COHEN RUTH

Not Classified By Court

RUTH COHEN

SINGER KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAGEMANN MICHAEL K

Defendant Attorneys

MALLEN THERESA LEA

BOESCH PHILIP WENDEL JR

HAWLEY KELLI GAY

STASER JOHN CHRISTOPHER JR

 

Court Documents

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION DEFENDANT NILOOFAR MOSHFEGH GELLERS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANT RUTH COHENS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/18/2019: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION DEFENDANT NILOOFAR MOSHFEGH GELLERS NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANT RUTH COHENS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NILOOFAR MOSHFEGH GELLERS ISO JOINDER IN DEFENDANT RUTH COHENS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

11/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NILOOFAR MOSHFEGH GELLERS ISO JOINDER IN DEFENDANT RUTH COHENS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS; EXHIBITS A THROUGH E; INCLUSIVE; PROOF OF SERVICE

10/17/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS; EXHIBITS A THROUGH E; INCLUSIVE; PROOF OF SERVICE

Ex Parte Application - PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO: STAY THE PUTATIVE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS COMMENCED BY DEFENDANTS AFTER FILING A PETITION TO HAVE THIS COURT DETERMINE ARBITRABILITY AND BEF

10/11/2019: Ex Parte Application - PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO: STAY THE PUTATIVE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS COMMENCED BY DEFENDANTS AFTER FILING A PETITION TO HAVE THIS COURT DETERMINE ARBITRABILITY AND BEF

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. HAGEMANN RE: EX PARTE TO STAY PUTATIVE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS; EXHIBITS 1 TO 7

10/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. HAGEMANN RE: EX PARTE TO STAY PUTATIVE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS; EXHIBITS 1 TO 7

Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. HAGEMANN RE EX PARTE TO STAY PUTATIVE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS (NEW EVIDENCE); EXHIBIT 8

10/11/2019: Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. HAGEMANN RE EX PARTE TO STAY PUTATIVE ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS (NEW EVIDENCE); EXHIBIT 8

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION

10/15/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NILOOFAR MOSHFEGH GELLER

10/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NILOOFAR MOSHFEGH GELLER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLI HAWLEY IN SUPPPORT OF OPP TO EX PARTE

10/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KELLI HAWLEY IN SUPPPORT OF OPP TO EX PARTE

Motion to Quash

10/15/2019: Motion to Quash

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/15/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO: STAY THE PUTATIVE ARBITR...)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO: STAY THE PUTATIVE ARBITR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER SHOUL...)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER SHOUL...)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO: (1) CONTINUE THE RECEIVER CONFIRMATION HEARING [CRC 3.1176 (D)]; AND (2) STAY OF DELIVERY OF LEVIED GOLD [CCP 512.020]

10/15/2019: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO: (1) CONTINUE THE RECEIVER CONFIRMATION HEARING [CRC 3.1176 (D)]; AND (2) STAY OF DELIVERY OF LEVIED GOLD [CCP 512.020]

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

10/15/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/15/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS; EXHIBITS A THROUGH F, INCLUSIVE; PROOF OF SERVICE

10/7/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDERS; EXHIBITS A THROUGH F, INCLUSIVE; PROOF OF SERVICE

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • Hearing05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Quash Ex Parte Writ of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Hearing05/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: why the appointment of Receiver should not be confirmed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Niloofar Moshfegh Geller?s ISO Joinder in Defendant Ruth Cohen?s Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Niloofar Moshfegh Geller (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketJoinder to Motion (Defendant Niloofar Moshfegh Geller?s Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Defendant Ruth Cohen?s Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by Niloofar Moshfegh Geller (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Edwin Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Orders; Exhibits A through E; Inclusive; Proof of Service); Filed by Edwin Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Joinder in Defendant Cohen's Motin to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings); Filed by Adam Gruen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND REQUEST FOR IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF JOHN C. STASER; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Filed by Ruth Cohen (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Marc D. Gross, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edwin Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edwin Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edwin Solorzano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WHOLESALE DIRECT METALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAGEMANN MICHAEL K.