Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 23:44:19 (UTC).

EDWIN MCCLURE VS FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 EDWIN MCCLURE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FPI MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0119

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCLURE EDWIN

Defendant

FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HEIT BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Notice - DEFENDANT FPI MANAGEMENT, INCS NOTICE OF ERRATA RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION

4/14/2021: Notice - DEFENDANT FPI MANAGEMENT, INCS NOTICE OF ERRATA RE JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/22/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDefendant Fpi Management, Inc?s Notice of Errata Re Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter To Binding Arbitration; Filed by FPI Management Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Edwin McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Edwin McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Edwin McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Edwin McClure (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIT BRIAN M.